Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mandarich Law Group Llp, against Carr, Horace, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2014 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Imaged
Date: May 08, 2014Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 08, 2014Declaration Filed
Date: April 08, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 08, 2014Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 08, 2014Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: November 13, 2014Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: November 13, 2014Declaration Filed
Date: November 13, 2014Request for Entry of Default and Request for Clerk's/Court
Date: November 13, 2014Declaration re:
Date: November 13, 2014Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: January 06, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 06, 2015Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: March 03, 2015Writ of Execution Returned - Contra Costa
Date: October 16, 2015Supplemental Writ Returned
Date: November 20, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.