Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Elias, Melissa, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Moss, Lawrence Jay, against Stone, Adam, represented by Clasen Raffalow & Rhoads, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with David S. Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 20, 2013 |
CategoryComplaint For Damages |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time362 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 20, 2013Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 20, 2013Summons Issued on
Date: November 20, 2013Notice Imaged
Date: April 15, 2014Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 15, 2014Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: September 08, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2014 | |||
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
|
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. - STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) ACTION - COMPLETE | |
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ADAM STONE | |
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY ADAM STONE FOR ANSWER/FIRST APPEARANCE 140908-1881-CK CVT/ 435.00 PAYMT | |
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Defendant First Paper Fee Paid in Full DEFENDANT ADAM STONE FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL |
|
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY ADAM STONE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CLASEN RAFFALOW & RHOADS. | |
September 05, 2014 | |||
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE DAVID COHN,JUDGE CLERK: GAIL ANDERSON COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS;4420 COURT ATTENDANT I ROMO - ATTORNEY INFORMATION LAWRENCE MOSS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MELISSA ELIAS. - PROCEEDINGS: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD - RESOLUTION WAS NOT REACHED; DEFENDANT WAS SERVED AND ANSWER PERIOD HAS NOT EXPIRED. MATTER IS CONTINUED FOR FURTHER CONFERENCE. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/22/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE. === MINUTE ORDER END === VACATE OSCDM HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/05/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.