Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn, Brian Nevins, against Ratts, Michael D, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 20, 2013 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions152 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time152 days |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 20, 2013Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 20, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 20, 2013Req for Ent of Default and Req for Clk/Ct Jmt Filed
Date: April 21, 2014Notice Imaged
Date: April 08, 2014Declaration Filed
Date: April 21, 2014Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: April 21, 2014Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: April 21, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 08, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY FILED. |
|
May 23, 2014 | |||
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Req for Ent of Default and Req for Clk/Ct Jmt Filed REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MICHAEL D RATTS. |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT CLERK'S CALENDAR | |
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF DISCOVER BANK AS TO DOES ONLY |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED | |
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL COLLECTIONS JUDGMENT WORKSHEET PRINTED. | |
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF DISCOVER BANK FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF DISCOVER BANK ORDERED ENTERED 04/21/14 JUDGMENT FOR: DISCOVER BANK JUDGMENT AGAINST: MICHAEL D RATTS JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $17,892.97 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $458.75 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $18351.72 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.