Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lobel Financial Corp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lobel, Gary Dean, against Santucci, Christina M, Santucci, Donald, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 13, 2013 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty(Ltd) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions100 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time140 days |
Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: April 02, 2014Request for Entry of Default and Request for Clerk's/Court
Date: February 21, 2014Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 13, 2013Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 08, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 13, 2013Notice Imaged
Date: April 04, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 23, 2014Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: February 21, 2014Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 13, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Orange WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM ORANGE COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed BANKRUPTCY DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR FILED. |
|
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY CASE MEETING FILED BY DONALD SANTUCCI, CHRISTINA M SANTUCCI. |
|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Orange WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY. ( 6919.52 ) |
|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ Fee Paid WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID 140527-0605-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 140527-0605-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 762724 |
|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 140527-0537-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 140527-0537-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 762725 | |
May 23, 2014 | |||
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.