Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Cheryl A. Houde presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCheryl A. Houde Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 13, 2013 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time498 days |
Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 12, 2015Conditional Settlement Agreement Filed
Date: July 02, 2014Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 13, 2013Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 03, 2015Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 01, 2016Notice Sent re:
Date: June 16, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 11, 2016Order Filed Re:
Date: August 19, 2016Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: October 06, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 27, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: November 03, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: November 07, 2016Order Filed Re:
Date: December 29, 2016Bench Warrant Recalled
Date: February 17, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 09, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 01, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: May 07, 2018Notice Sent re:
Date: May 16, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $40.00 FOR WRIT PAID ON 01/19/2022 FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION TO ORANGE COUNTY |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued - Orange | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR LYNN PONCIN,JUDGE CLERK: ILAYALI WADE COURT REPORTER PEGGY OGAZ;9203 COURT ATTENDANT C. BELLAMY - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD - NO APPEARANCE. THE COURT NOTES A PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE APPLICATION FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR HAS NOT BEEN FILED. OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: FAILURE TO SERVE/FAILURE TO APPEAR ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY ADVANCE RESTAURANTFINANCE LLC FOR ORAP 191022-0575-CK MMF/ 60.00 PAYMT 191022-0575-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 88690 | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR MICHAEL A SACHS,JUDGE CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA;13709 COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD 08:32 OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCES; NO PROOF OF SERVICE ON ORAP ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Santa Clara WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM SANTA CLARA COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $40.00. |
|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | SUBPOENAS DESTROYED. | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. 190626-0044-CK MMF/ 60.00 PAYMT 190626-0044-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 82685 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.