Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Aguirre, David, Aguirre, Wanda, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by De Clue Law Group, Pc, against Carrington Foreclosure Services, Llc, Carrington Mortgage Services, Llc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Indenture Trustee For New Century Home, represented by Alvarado Smith, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Donald R. Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald R. Alvarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management536 days |
Filing DateOctober 24, 2013 |
CategoryReal Property |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions544 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time544 days |
Comment: (Imaged)
Date: April 07, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 28, 2014Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: November 01, 2013Order Filed Re:
Date: October 28, 2013Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 24, 2013Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: April 01, 2014Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: April 01, 2014Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 07, 2013Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 07, 2013Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 05, 2013Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 24, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 24, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2015 | |||
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO BE RELIVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVID AGUIRRE |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY DEFENDANT WANDA AGUIRRE |
|
May 12, 2015 | |||
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: SUBMISSION OF JUDGMENT/ORDER |
|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC, CARRINGTON FORECLOSURE SERVICES, LLC, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS, FOR 1485.00. |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL FILED BY CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC. |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDR SUSTAINING DEMRRER FILED BY CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC. |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF DAVID AGUIRRE FILED JUDGMENT ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF DAVID AGUIRRE ORDERED ENTERED 04/21/15 JUDGMENT FOR: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC, CARRINGTON FORECLOSURE SERVICES, LLC, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS AND AGAINST DAVID AGUIRRE, WANDA AGUIRRE CASE IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS AND EACH OF THEM. PLAINTIFFS AHLL RECOVER NOTHING AND DEFENDANTS ARE ENTITLED TO RECOVER COSTS AND CAN SUBMIT A MEMORANDUM OF COSTS. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT W/OUT LEAVE TO AMEND FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.