Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fidelity Recovery Service, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gordon Law Office, against Commercial Wood Products Company, Company,A Corporati, Commercial W Ood Products, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Brian S. McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian S. McCarville Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2013 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions73 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time73 days |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 12, 2013Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 12, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 12, 2013Req for Ent of Default and Req for Clk/Ct Jmt Filed
Date: September 11, 2013Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: August 06, 2013Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: September 11, 2013Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 12, 2013Declaration Filed
Date: September 23, 2013Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: September 23, 2013Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: October 10, 2013Req to Ent Default Alrdy Entered. Req Clk/Ct Jmt Filed
Date: September 23, 2013Cost Bill After Judgment Filed
Date: October 10, 2013Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino
Date: October 18, 2013ORAP Returned Served
Date: December 05, 2013Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: December 16, 2013Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: January 30, 2014Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: April 08, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 09, 2014Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino
Date: April 17, 2014Order Filed Re:
Date: April 24, 2014Bench Warrant
Date: April 28, 2014Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 28, 2014Bench Warrant Recalled
Date: April 28, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 28, 2014Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 30, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 12, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF FIDELITY RECOVERY SERVICE FILED ADDING FIDELITY CREDITOR SERVIVES, INC AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT. | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed FINAL RETURN TO COURT WRIT OF EXECUTION FILED. |
|
August 04, 2014 |
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ;10911 COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JOHN STOBART FOR PLAINTIFF. COMMERCIAL WOOD PRODUCTS COMPANY REPRESENTED BY CRAIG ROBERTS. - PROCEEDINGS: POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD JUDGMENT DEBTOR CRAIG ROBERTS IS REMINDED THAT HIS OATH CONTINUES. - JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION RESUMES. - 09:30 JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION CONCLUDES WITHOUT FURTHER INTERVENTION FROM THE COURT. JUDGEMENT DEBTOR IS RELEASED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
July 21, 2014 |
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN;12453 COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JOHN STOBART PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. COMMERCIAL WOOD PRODUCTS COMPANY REPRESENTED BY CRAIG ROBERTS. - PROCEEDINGS: POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD JUDGMENT DEBTOR CRAIG ROBERTS IS ADMONISHED THAT HE WAS PREVIOUSLY SWORN AND HIS OATH CONTINUES AND MUST ANSWER ALL QUESTIONS AND PRODUCE REQUESTED DOCUMENTS. - SUBSEQUENTLY, THE PARTIES RETURN. JUDGMENT DEBTOR INDICATES THAT HE WAS NOT SERVED WITH THE ORIGINAL SUBPOENA AND THEREFORE DID NOT PRODUCE ALL THE DOCUMENTS REQUESTED. HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. REASON: FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS LIST OF ITEMS BEING REQUESTED IS RECITED BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL INTO THE RECORD. - JUDGMENT DEBTOR IS ADMONISHED THAT FAILURE TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE THE REQUESTED DOCUMENTS WILL RESULT IN JAIL TIME. CRAIG ROBERTS IS/ARE ORDERED TO RETURN ON CONTINUED DATE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE OR SUBPOENA. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/04/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30. === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
June 04, 2014 |
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ARRAIGNMENT ON BENCH WARRANT BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ;10911 COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JOHN STOBART FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. COMMERCIAL WOOD PRODUCTS COMPANY REPRESENTED BY CRAIG ROBERTS. - PROCEEDINGS: POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD BASED ON THE STATEMENT BY THE JUDGMENT DEBTOR THAT HE DOES NOT HAVE THE AMOUNT OF $65,546.90 TO PAY THE JUDGMENT, THE COURT ORDERS THE JUDGMENT DEBTOR REMANDED INTO CUSTODY. - 08:46 SUBSEQUENTLY, UPON ARRIVAL BY THE BAILIFF, SPECIAL APPEARANCE COUNSEL DECLINES THE REMAND ORDER AND OPTS TO CONDUCT THE JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION. COMMERCIAL WOOD PRODUCTS COMPANY PRESENT, DEBTOR SWORN, EXAMINED AND EXCUSED/DISCHARGED. - 09:47 MATTER RECALLED. HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. REASON: FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR TO PRODUCE REQUESTED DOCUMENTS CRAIG ROBERTS IS/ARE ORDERED TO RETURN ON CONTINUED DATE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE OR SUBPOENA. FAILURE TO APPEAR ON THE CONTINUED DATE WILL RESULT IN ISSUANCE OF A NO BAIL WARRANT. - HEARINGS: ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SET FOR/CONTINUED TO 07/21/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30J. === MINUTE ORDER END === ACTION - COMPLETE |
|
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF BENCH WARRANT BY PERSONAL ON 04/21/14 AS TO CRAIG ROBERTS, FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.