Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Portfolio Recover Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt & Henriques, against Hernandez, Jose, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 23, 2013Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 23, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 23, 2013Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: July 22, 2013Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: July 22, 2013Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: August 21, 2013Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: October 01, 2015Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: September 21, 2017Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino
Date: May 26, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( $1,224.47 ) |
|
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ Fee Paid WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID 170926-0378-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 170926-0378-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 740583 |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $859.29) |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Credit Filed. Credit in the Amount of ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,478.09) FILED. |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( 5752.56 ) 151006-1704-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 151006-1704-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 580474 |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $859.29) |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Credit Filed. Credit in the Amount of ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,950.00) FILED. |
|
November 22, 2013 | |||
November 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.