Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rodriguez, Melissa, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against American Family Mutual Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Bryan F. Foster presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2013 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Petition |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time143 days |
Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 18, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 18, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 18, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 18, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 18, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 18, 2013Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 18, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2014 | |||
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes STATUS HEARING ON PETITION |
|
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF RULING RE STATUS CONFERENCE FILED BY AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (IMAGED) |
|
July 11, 2013 |
Judge: Foster, Bryan |
||
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes STATUS HEARING ON PETITION BRYAN F FOSTER,JUDGE CLERK: LORI MOWLES COURT REPORTER JILL LANGLEY;7663 COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY AMY FREELAND PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD COURT SETS MATTER FOR HEARING AFTER BINDING ARBITRATION DATE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/27/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37. NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY COUNSEL. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed COPY OF SUBPOENA ISSUED TO NV DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES FILED. |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed COPY OF SUBPOENA ISSUED TO UNIVERSITY OF PHOENIX NV FILED. |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed COPY OF SUBPOENA ISSUED TO COLLEGE OF SOUTHERN NEVADA FILED. |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed COPY OF SUBPOENA ISSUED TO HELP FOR SOUTHERN NEVADA FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.