Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
County Of San Bernardino, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by San Bernardino County Counsel, against Stout, Lorraine, Stout, William, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 12, 2013 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions164 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time172 days |
Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: October 01, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 12, 2013Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: October 28, 2013Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 12, 2013Req for Ent of Default and Req for Clk/Ct Jmt Filed
Date: September 23, 2013Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: September 23, 2013Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 12, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
October 18, 2013 | |||
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
|
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/18/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31. |
|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO ORDERED ENTERED 10/01/13 JUDGMENT FOR: COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO JUDGMENT AGAINST: WILLIAM STOUT, LORRAINE STOUT JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $34,946.30 INTEREST $4,077.07 ATTORNEY FEES $2,202.84 COSTS $543.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $41769.21 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED. |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Req for Ent of Default and Req for Clk/Ct Jmt Filed REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON WILLIAM STOUT, LORRAINE STOUT. |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO AS TO DOES ONLY |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED | |
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT CLERK'S CALENDAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.