Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Vankooten, Bonita, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Raynes Erickson, against Redlands Community Hospital, Thorpe M.D., Gerald, represented by Madory Zell Pleiss & Mcgrath, Tan, Domingo Reynaldo, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Brian S. McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 12, 2013 |
CategoryComplaint For Medical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions525 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time612 days |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 12, 2013Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 12, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 12, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 29, 2013Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 24, 2013Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: April 24, 2013Stipulation Filed re:
Date: May 05, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2014 |
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN;12453 COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY COUNSEL TO OPPOSE DISMISSAL, THE COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER DISMISSED. ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NTC OF DISMISSAL TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF BONITA VANKOOTEN AS TO DOES ONLY |
|
November 17, 2014 | |||
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS. |
|
November 13, 2014 |
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes READINESS CALENDAR BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER BRENDA ELIA;11830 COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, THE COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR: OSC RE: DISMISSAL - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 12/15/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30 NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT VACATE JT HEARING ON 11/17/14 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S30. === MINUTE ORDER END === === MINUTE ORDER END === ACTION - COMPLETE |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. | |
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO GERALD THORPE MD, WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 28, 2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.