Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Ge Capital Retail Bank Lowes, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Suttell & Hammer, Apc, against Williams, Starla, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with David S. Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 12, 2013 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions322 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time322 days |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 12, 2013Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 12, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 12, 2013Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 24, 2013Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: May 13, 2013Order Filed Re:
Date: September 24, 2013Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: February 28, 2014Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: April 04, 2014Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 29, 2015Cost Bill After Judgment Filed
Date: May 29, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 19, 2016Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles
Date: April 22, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,373.47 |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY FIRM AND ADDRESS CHANGE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF GE. |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed - Status is now: JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED. |
|
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF GE FOR WRIT 150604-0191-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 150604-0191-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 173403 | |
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( $3398.47 ) |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY FIRM AND ADDRESS CHANGE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF GE. |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Credits Filed. Credits in the Amount of DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $990.00 FILED. |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $307.36 | |
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING BISHOP WHITE MARSHALL & WEIBEL, PS WITH SUTTELL HAMMER & WHITE, APC AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF GE. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.