Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Meridian Moulding, Inc, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate case against Labor Commissioner Of The State Of California, Division Of Labor Standards, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with David S. Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid S. Cohn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2013 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions516 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time516 days |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 14, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 14, 2013Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 14, 2013Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: April 17, 2013Declaration Filed
Date: June 07, 2013Motion Filed
Date: June 07, 2013Order Filed Re:
Date: July 09, 2013Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 19, 2013Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 16, 2013Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 27, 2013Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: October 01, 2013Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of
Date: October 01, 2013Notice Imaged
Date: April 11, 2014Comment: (Imaged)
Date: August 26, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 06, 2014Comment: (Imaged)
Date: August 26, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed RETURN TO PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDAMUS BY LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED. |
|
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Comment: (Imaged) PRF OF SRVC OF PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDAMUS SERVED ON 8/13/14 BY MAIL WITH $0.00 FEE (IMAGED) |
|
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Comment: (Imaged) NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED) |
|
August 20, 2014 | |||
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED WRIT/PROPOSED JUDGMENT |
|
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDAMUS - FILED. (IMAGED) |
|
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) OF MERIDIAN MOULDING,INC FILED JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) OF MERIDIAN MOULDING,INC ORDERED ENTERED 07/15/14 JUDGMENT FOR: MERIDIAN MOULDING,INC JUDGMENT AGAINST: LABOR COMMISSIONEROF THE STATE OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5000.00 SEE JUDGMENT FOR FULL DETAILS NOTICES PRINTED STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
June 06, 2014 |
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE DAVID COHN,JUDGE CLERK: GAIL ANDERSON COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON;11800 COURT ATTENDANT I ROMO - ATTORNEY INFORMATION ATTORNEY ANTHONY CASO PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY EDNA GARCIA EARLEY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD - MERIDIAN MOULDING,INC'S MOTION /PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE IS HEARD. ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED. - MERIDIAN MOULDING,INC'S MOTION /PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE IS GRANTED. THE COURT ORDERS THAT A WRIT SHOULD ISSUE VACATING THE DECISION OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE HEARING OFFICER, ELIMINATING THE ISSUED FINE AND VOIDING THE STOP ORDER. PETITIONER IS THE PREVAILING PARTY FOR PURPOSES OF COSTS/FEE RECOVERY. - PETITIONER TO PREPARE PROPOSED WRIT AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT. AND SUBMIT TO OPPOSING COUNSEL FOR APPROVAL AS TO FORM AND CONTENT. - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED WRIT/PROPOSED JUDGMENT SET FOR 08/20/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37J. COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER TO GIVE NOTICE. === MINUTE ORDER END === |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.