Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Qvc, Inc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Hatkoff & Minassian A Law Corporation, against Franklin, Kennedy, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2012 |
CategorySister State Judgment Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Cost Bill After Judgment Filed
Date: October 04, 2013Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles
Date: October 11, 2013Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: May 14, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 14, 2012Document(s) Placed in File
Date: December 14, 2012Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 15, 2013Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: February 01, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 14, 2012Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): In order to file, a $45.00 CK is required along with Application for renewal of Judgment |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( 36865.85 ) 131011-3213-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT |
|
October 04, 2013 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $68.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,737.43 | |
October 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Credits Filed. Credits in the Amount of DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $300.00 FILED. |
|
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 130514-3122-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 130514-3122-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 10612 | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KENNEDY FRANKLIN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/12/13 (IMAGED) |
|
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO KENNEDY FRANKLIN. (IMAGED) |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document(s) Placed in File COPY OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE JUDGMENT PLACED IN FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.