Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chapman Heights Community Association, A California Non-Profit Mutual Benefit Corpor, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Peters & Freedman, against Gucilatar, Cecil Mervyn, Gucilatar, Elma Bella, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Bryan F. Foster presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBryan F. Foster Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2012 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions188 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time252 days |
Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino
Date: August 10, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 26, 2014Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: March 24, 2014Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: March 24, 2014Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption Filed
Date: March 24, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 03, 2013Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: May 06, 2013Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: May 06, 2013Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: May 16, 2013ORAP Returned Served
Date: June 13, 2013Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 26, 2013Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 16, 2012Bench Warrant
Date: October 11, 2013Writ of Execution Returned - Riverside
Date: May 22, 2015Bench Warrant Recalled
Date: October 21, 2013Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 28, 2013Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino
Date: December 26, 2013Writ of Execution Issued - Riverside
Date: December 26, 2013Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption Filed
Date: March 26, 2014Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 28, 2013Comment:
Date: August 29, 2013Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: January 14, 2013Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: February 20, 2013Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 11, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 11, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Riverside LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM RIVERSIDE COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY WITH COSTS OF $36.00. |
|
August 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,426.07 WITH COSTS OF $96.00. |
|
April 22, 2014 |
Judge: Foster, Bryan |
||
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - ELMA BELLA GUCILATAR BRYAN F FOSTER,JUDGE CLERK: LORI MOWLES NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY MICKEY JEW PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ELMA BELLA GUCILATAR - PROCEEDINGS: POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD - MOTION CLAIM OF EXEMPTION SUBMITTED. CLAIM OF EXEMPTION GRANTED. - COURT FINDS: THE LEVYING OFFICER IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE ANY MONIES HELD TO THE JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR PAYMENT ON THE JUDGMENT. ORDER TO LEVYING OFFICER PRINTED FOR CHAPMAN HEIGHTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, A ORDER TO LEVYING OFFICER ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION ELECTRONICALLY SENT TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT/CIVIL DIVISION FOR ELMA BELLA GUCILATAR ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - CECIL MERVYN GUCILATAR BRYAN F FOSTER,JUDGE CLERK: LORI MOWLES NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY MICKEY JEW PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. DEFENDANT CECIL MERVYN GUCILATAR PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD - MOTION CLAIM OF EXEMPTION SUBMITTED. CLAIM OF EXEMPTION GRANTED. IN PART THE LEVYING OFFICER IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE ANY MONIES HELD TO THE JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR PAYMENT ON THE JUDGMENT. COURT ORDERS ALL MONIES EXEMPT EXCEPT $500.00 PER MONTH. ORDER TO LEVYING OFFICER ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION ELECTRONICALLY SENT TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT/CIVIL DIVISION FOR CECIL MERVYN GUCILATAR ORDER TO LEVYING OFFICER PRINTED FOR CECIL MERVYN GUCILATAR LEVYING OFFICER LOCATION: RIVERSIDE COUNTY ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION ISSUED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed CLAIM OF EXEMPTION COVER SHEET FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SHERIFF FILED. |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED. | |
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event | CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FORM FILED BY CECIL MERVYN GUCILATAR, ELMA BELLA GUCILATAR | |
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Update Party Address PARTY ELMA BELLA GUCILATAR UPDATED: MAILING ADDRESS |
|
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Filed NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - CECIL MERVYN GUCILATAR FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.