Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gonzalez-Lopez, Horalia, Lopez, Jaime, Lopez, Jr, Jaime, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Michels & Lew, against Daniels, M.D., Betty, Dignity Health, A California Corporation, Felix-Trunnelle, M. D., Elizabeth, Sanders Rn R.N., Rita, St. Bernardino Medical Center, (total of 7) See All represented by Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, Schmid & Voiles, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with John M. Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 15, 2012 |
CategoryComplaint For Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time722 days |
Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 26, 2012Petition & Order for Appt of Guardian Ad Litem Granted
Date: August 28, 2012Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 30, 2013Coversheet for Rejected Document
Date: August 15, 2012Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 12, 2012Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 12, 2012Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: October 26, 2012Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 16, 2012Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 14, 2013Notice Imaged
Date: February 25, 2014Order Filed Re:
Date: August 07, 2014Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2014 | |||
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF ANNUITY |
|
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/06/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31. |
|
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF ANNUITY FILED. |
|
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEFENDANT DISMISSED ON 080714 . |
|
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR JOHN M PACHECO,JUDGE CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN;12453 COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JEROME CALKINS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. PLAINTIFF HORALIA GONZALEZ-LOPEZ, JAIME LOPEZ PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THE COURT FINDS THAT THE PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM IS IN THE BEST INTEREST OF JAIME LOPEZ JR. SETTLEMENT APPROVED IN THE SUM OF $999,999.00 ATTORNEY FEES OF $139,888.89 AND EXPENSES IN THE AMOUNT OF $67,406.37 ARE APPROVED. THE BALANCE OF $792,703.74 IS ORDERED DEPOSITED IN A TRUST ACCOUNT WITH THE PETITIONER AS TRUSTEE AT DEPOSIT INTO AN ANNUITY WITH NO FUNDS TO BE WITHDRAWN WITHOUT FIRST OBTAINING ORDER OF COURT. - ORDERS APPROVING COMPROMISE AND TO DEPOSIT FUNDS ARE SIGNED BY THE COURT. - HEARINGS: HEARING RE:PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF ANNUITY SET FOR 11/06/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31. NO APPEARANCE REQUIRED PROVIDED RETURN IS FILED WITH THE COURT PRIOR TO DATE OF CONTINUANCE. ACTION - COMPLETE |
|
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION OF MINOR JAIME LOPEZ JR FILED |
|
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JAIME LOPEZ, JR BY JAIME LOPEZ, JR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.