Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Arroyo Jr., Rafael, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Center For Disability Access, Llp, against Rhp Enterprises, Inc., A California Corporation, represented by Equity Law Group Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Bryan F. Foster presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management183 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2012 |
CategoryCivil Rights - Discrimination |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time580 days |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 13, 2012Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 03, 2012Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed is Granted
Date: August 06, 2012Order Filed Re:
Date: July 10, 2013Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 14, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON 3-5-14. |
|
March 05, 2014 |
Judge: Foster, Bryan |
||
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL RE SETTLEMENT BRYAN F FOSTER,JUDGE CLERK: MONICA REAL-RAMOS COURT REPORTER ROSIE SAMPLES;12383 COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY DENNIS PRICE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR RAFAEL ARROYO JR. P EQUITY LAW GROUP LL FOR RHP ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA NOT PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. PLAINTIFF WILL ALSO FILE A DISMISSAL TO BE FILED AND PLACED IN FILE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
January 07, 2014 |
Judge: Foster, Bryan |
||
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL RE SETTLEMENT BRYAN F FOSTER,JUDGE CLERK: LORI MOWLES NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY SUZANNE KLUMP FOR PLAINTIFF. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL. REASON: SETTLEMENT NEEDS FUNDED - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/05/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Filed NOTICE OF HEARING ON OSC RE DISMISSAL/SETTLEMENT FILED. |
|
November 18, 2013 | |||
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS. |
|
November 14, 2013 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.