Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn Law Group, Apc, against Newman, Kristen L, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Michael A. Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management197 days |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2012 |
CategoryCollections (Ltd) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions410 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time407 days |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 04, 2012Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 21, 2012Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed is Granted
Date: July 09, 2012Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 11, 2013Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 14, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 08, 2013Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: July 24, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 130724-0774-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 130724-0774-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 567771 | |
July 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF FILED. |
|
July 05, 2013 |
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC MICHAEL A SACHS,JUDGE CLERK: ANCHALEE M PRICE COURT REPORTER MEEMO TOMASSIAN;10435 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JOHN GORDON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KRISTEN L NEWMAN - PROCEEDINGS: 05A*SCTHLD. 11:05 1ST DAY OF TRIAL - MATTER PROCEEDS BY WAY OF CCP 98 DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF 06/12/13. - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO HAVE FACTS DEEMED AS ADMITTED GRANTED 05/20/13. - COURT FINDS: JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 07/05/13 JUDGMENT FOR: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC JUDGMENT AGAINST: KRISTEN L NEWMAN JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $17,530.73 INTEREST $5,721.60 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $525.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $23777.33 JUDGMENT SIGNED. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV) === MINUTE ORDER END === ACTION - COMPLETE |
|
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event | TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: IN LIEU OF LIVE WITNESS TESTIMONY AT TRIAL FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC | |
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC. |
|
May 20, 2013 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM FACTS AS ADMITTED FILED |
|
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: DEEM FACTS AS ADMITTED/ REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON;11800 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY LAURA MCCARTHY HOALST PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KRISTEN L NEWMAN - MOTION CAVALRY SPV I, LLC'S MOTION TO DEEM FACTS AS ADMITTED IS HEARD. SUBMITTED ON POINTS AND AUTHORITIES NO OPPOSITION FILED AND/OR PRESENTED. - COURT FINDS: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC'S MOTION TO DEEM FACTS AS ADMITTED IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IS DENIED. ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE. - HEARINGS: HEARING DATE OF 07/05/13 CONFIRMED. (RE COURT TRIAL SET @11:00 AM IN DEPT S32) NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 5/20/13 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.