Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rosales, Jorge Raul, The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against $1461.00 U S Currency, $1,540.00 U S Currency, $3,001.00 Us Currency, Chavarin, Emmanuel A, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Brian S. McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian S. McCarville Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management302 days |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2011 |
CategoryClaim Opposing Forfeiture |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions323 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time323 days |
Order Filed Re:
Date: July 23, 2014Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 03, 2013Document(s) Placed in File
Date: September 04, 2012Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: November 09, 2012Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 10, 2012Order Filed Re:
Date: October 19, 2012Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 22, 2011Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: June 25, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER DISMISSING CASE & RETURNING PROPERTY FILED |
|
June 20, 2014 |
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
June 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS COURT REPORTER JILL LANGLEY;7663 COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: DEPUTY DA JAMES R. SECORD PRESENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD COUNSEL ADVISES THE COURT THERE WERE TWO PARTIES THAT WERE SERVED HOWEVER ONLY ONE PARTY HAS SUBMITTED A CLAIM. - THE COURT ORDERS ALL MONEY RETURNED TO CLAIMANT AND CASE DISMISSED. DDA JAMES SECORD TO PREPARE ORDER. ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: MONEY TO BE RETURNED TO CLAIMANT. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
June 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/20/14 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT S4. |
|
June 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE |
|
February 21, 2014 |
Judge: Pirozzi, Elia V |
||
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE ELIA V. PIROZZI,JUDGE CLERK: MYRNA THOMAS COURT REPORTER IDA APPLEBY;6243 - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JAMES SECORD PRESENT FOR PEOPLE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD - HEARINGS: HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PEOPLE. HEARING RE:STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 06/20/14 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT S4. - ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF STATUS HEARING FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. |
|
November 15, 2013 |
Judge: Dorr, James M |
||
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes STATUS CONFERENCE JAMES M DORR,JUDGE CLERK: TINA YBARRA COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW;9396 BAILIFF: N RIOS - APPEARANCES: DEPUTY DA CAMIN WHITTAKER PRESENT. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JORGE RAUL ROSALES, EMMANUEL A CHAVARIN - PROCEEDINGS: PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD. - HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PEOPLE. - HEARINGS: HEARING RE:STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 02/21/14 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT S4. - NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY PEOPLE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.