Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavalry Portfolio Services, Llc As Assigneeof Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Hsbc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn Law Group, Apc, against Curley, Marlene, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2011 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles
Date: December 14, 2011Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 10, 2011Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: December 23, 2015Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: September 13, 2011Cost Bill After Judgment Filed
Date: December 09, 2011Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: September 13, 2011Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: December 14, 2011Notice of Bankruptcy Filed (Entire Case Stayed)
Date: April 12, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 05, 2017Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: September 13, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER OF DISCHARGE- CHAPTER 7 FILED. |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Sacramento LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SACRAMENTO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Bankruptcy Filed (Entire Case Stayed) NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY MARLENE CURLEY |
|
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,524.88) |
|
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Sacramento WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY. ( 5144.63 ) 151223-0406-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 151223-0406-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 664382 |
|
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Credit Filed. Credit in the Amount of ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $670.92) FILED. |
|
June 01, 2012 | |||
June 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( 4387.78 ) 111214-1784-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 111214-1784-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 493148 |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 111214-1834-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 111214-1834-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 493147 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.