Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark, Rory William, against Hill, Keyunda, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2011 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the plaintiff, Midland Funding LLC, against the defendant, Keyunda Hill. The complaint states that the defendant was properly served with a copy of the summons and complaint but failed to answer or defend t...
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 08, 2011Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: May 24, 2011Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 24, 2011Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: October 28, 2011Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: May 24, 2011Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: May 24, 2011Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles
Date: November 01, 2011Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: July 25, 2011Declaration Filed
Date: May 24, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles
Date: February 04, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $30.00. |
|
March 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed - Status is now: JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED. |
|
March 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,626.51 |
|
February 03, 2012 | |||
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( 1651.51 ) 111101-0946-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 111101-0946-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 96948 |
|
October 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $61.03) |
|
August 12, 2011 | |||
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
July 25, 2011 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 110725-0108-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 110725-0108-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 91327 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.