Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fowler, Robert Bruce, Lucky Strike Farms, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Liberty, Michael D., against Fowler, Robert Bruce, represented by Niles, Jennifer A., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Joseph C. Scott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph C. Scott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateJune 02, 2016 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial340 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions379 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time379 days |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: April 03, 2017Response
Date: November 15, 2016Notice of Entry of Order
Date: April 12, 2017Memorandum of Costs
Date: May 11, 2017Motion
Date: November 01, 2016Answer (Unlimited)
Date: July 26, 2016Declaration
Date: May 17, 2017Notice
Date: June 20, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: June 20, 2017Declaration in Support
Date: January 13, 2017Notice
Date: December 20, 2016Judgment
Date: June 16, 2017Order
Date: June 16, 2017Notice
Date: May 17, 2017Motion
Date: May 17, 2017Default Prove-Up Hearing
Date: May 08, 2017Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt
Date: May 08, 2017Order to Show Cause
Date: April 13, 2017Order to Show Cause
Date: April 05, 2017Declaration
Date: April 03, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: February 10, 2017Order
Date: December 12, 2016Motion hearings
Date: November 22, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 07, 2016Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: November 07, 2016Case Management Conference
Date: October 06, 2016Answer (Unlimited)
Date: August 26, 2016Cross Complaint
Date: July 26, 2016Complaint
Date: June 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment issued Amount:103,109 |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AT 10% Notice OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AT 10% |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment JUDGMENT BY COURT JUDGMENT BY COURT |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Type: GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AT 10%Signed by: JOSEPH SCOTTDate Order Type: GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AT 10% Signed by: JOSEPH SCOTT Date Signed: 06/16/2017 |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Prejudgment Interest
Judge: Scott, Joseph C. |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion granted. Moving party: Plaintiff Motion title: Prejudgment Interest and Judgment |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF MICHAEL D LIBERTY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AT 10% Declaration OF MICHAEL D LIBERTY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AT 10% |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of MOTION AND MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AT 10% Notice of MOTION AND MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AT 10% |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AT 10% Motion FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AT 10% |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.