Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Baffoni, Garrett, Huff, Steven, Lahr, Jonathan, Lee, Timothy, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ross, Trevor L, against Bialer, Len, Heritage Realty, Laurine Varrial Trust, L. Bialer And Associates, Michaud, Terry, (total of 6) See All represented by Armstrong, Nolan S., Bellotti, Jerome P, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Susan I. Etezadi presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management78 days |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2016 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial376 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time218 days |
Case Management Statement
Date: August 09, 2016Answer (Unlimited)
Date: July 01, 2016Request For Dismissal
Date: February 27, 2017Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: October 05, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: August 25, 2016Amended Complaint
Date: June 21, 2016Complaint
Date: April 27, 2016Notice of Settlement of Entire Case
Date: December 01, 201610 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: September 23, 2016Case Management Conference
Date: August 25, 2016Answer (Unlimited)
Date: June 22, 2016Conversion Action
Date: May 31, 2016Declaration
Date: May 31, 2016Ex Parte
Date: May 31, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 7 DAYS
Judge: Etezadi, Susan I. |
|
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE Request For Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE |
|
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 4/26/17 Notice of Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 4/26/17 |
|
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Case CONDITIONAL Notice of Settlement of Entire Case CONDITIONAL |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event | ADR Evaluation Notice Sent | |
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to ADR
Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept 21 ADR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.