Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alton Consulting, Llc, Geller, Kathy D, Huang, Yanqiao, Kearns, Loyd, Ua Local 13 Pension Fund, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited Class Action case represented by Glancy, Lionel Z, Jasnoch, John T, Rosen, Laurence M, Walton, David Conrad, against Allen & Company Llc, Bmo Capital Markets Corp, Ciporin, Daniel, Ciporin, Daniel T, Citigroup Global Markets Inc, (total of 34) See All represented by Doolittle, Diane M., Liubicic, Robert J, Shimada, Charlene S., Strauss, Simona G., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Marie S. Weiner presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management89 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2016 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited Class Action |
Time To Trial951 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions153 days |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time738 days |
Motion for Approval
Date: November 02, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 31, 2016Order
Date: May 18, 2016Stipulation & Order
Date: March 05, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: November 08, 2017Declaration
Date: June 24, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 07, 2017Order
Date: April 05, 2018Declaration
Date: May 26, 2017Opposition
Date: May 08, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 09, 2016Reply
Date: March 10, 2017Order for Permissive eFiling and Amendment of CMC Order #1
Date: December 02, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: May 26, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: September 26, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: January 17, 2017Declaration
Date: May 08, 2017Declaration
Date: September 23, 2016Declaration
Date: July 11, 2016Notice
Date: April 02, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: August 26, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 31, 2016Notice of Entry of Order
Date: March 07, 2018Case Management Order
Date: January 31, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: November 07, 2017Case Management Order
Date: September 26, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 02, 2016Declaration
Date: September 02, 2016Case Management Order
Date: December 12, 2016Declaration
Date: August 09, 2016Declaration
Date: February 07, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 11, 2016Declaration
Date: June 02, 2016Stipulation & Order
Date: November 22, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 07, 2017Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: August 31, 2016Supplemental
Date: March 10, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 25, 2016Declaration in Support
Date: February 07, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 09, 2016Declaration
Date: July 25, 2016Order
Date: November 07, 2017Notice
Date: May 24, 2016Declaration
Date: July 28, 2016Notice of Entry of Order
Date: July 24, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 09, 2016Declaration
Date: August 01, 2016Opposition
Date: June 24, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 22, 2018Reply
Date: September 23, 2016Notice
Date: August 01, 2016Reply
Date: March 10, 2017Declaration
Date: August 31, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 31, 2016Declaration
Date: June 02, 2017Notice
Date: May 20, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: February 24, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: June 30, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 26, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: June 28, 2017Declaration in Support
Date: April 03, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: August 11, 2016Declaration
Date: February 24, 2017Stipulation & Order
Date: September 21, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: April 03, 2017Motion for Approval
Date: October 24, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: October 23, 2018Stipulation & Order
Date: May 18, 2018Order
Date: May 17, 2018Declaration
Date: May 16, 2018Order
Date: April 13, 2018Notice of Motion re:
Date: April 02, 2018Case Management Order
Date: January 19, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: November 07, 2017Order
Date: October 25, 2017Order
Date: June 23, 2017Order
Date: June 09, 2017Order
Date: June 09, 2017Case Management Order
Date: June 09, 2017Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: June 08, 2017Motion to Certify Class Action
Date: June 08, 2017Motion
Date: June 02, 2017Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: June 01, 2017Opposition
Date: May 08, 2017Joinder
Date: May 08, 2017Opposition
Date: May 08, 2017Case Management Order
Date: April 05, 2017Answer
Date: April 03, 2017Motion for Class Certification
Date: April 03, 2017Case Management Order
Date: March 29, 2017Case Management Order
Date: March 20, 2017Hearing on Demurrer
Date: March 16, 2017Discovery Conference
Date: March 16, 2017Reply
Date: March 10, 2017Stipulation & Order
Date: February 23, 2017Joinder
Date: February 07, 2017Declaration in Support
Date: February 07, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: February 07, 2017Demurrer to Amended Complaint
Date: February 07, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 07, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: February 07, 2017Document
Date: February 07, 2017Demurrer to
Date: February 07, 2017Joinder
Date: July 11, 2016Order
Date: July 05, 2016Document
Date: June 03, 2016Document
Date: June 02, 2016Document
Date: May 23, 2016Order
Date: May 16, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: May 13, 2016Order
Date: May 16, 2016Conversion Action
Date: May 11, 2016Conversion Action
Date: May 11, 2016Document
Date: May 05, 2016Declaration
Date: May 05, 2016Order
Date: April 27, 2016Document
Date: April 28, 2016Conversion Action
Date: April 12, 2016Conversion Action
Date: April 11, 2016Complaint
Date: February 26, 2016Stipulation & Order
Date: February 07, 2017Case Management Order
Date: January 19, 2017Discovery Conference
Date: December 09, 2016Case Management Conference
Date: December 09, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: December 02, 2016Case Management Order
Date: October 03, 2016Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: September 30, 2016Objection
Date: September 23, 2016Supplemental
Date: September 23, 2016Reply
Date: September 23, 2016Reply
Date: September 23, 2016Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 02, 2016Order
Date: September 02, 2016Declaration
Date: August 31, 2016Joinder
Date: August 31, 2016Declaration
Date: August 31, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 31, 2016Notice
Date: August 31, 2016Demurrer to
Date: August 31, 2016Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 31, 2016Demurrer to
Date: August 31, 2016Joinder
Date: August 31, 2016Demurrer to
Date: August 31, 2016Stipulation & Order
Date: August 30, 2016Stipulation & Order
Date: August 26, 2016Demurrer to
Date: August 09, 2016Joinder
Date: August 09, 2016Joinder
Date: August 09, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 09, 2016Notice
Date: August 09, 2016Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 09, 2016Demurrer to
Date: August 09, 2016Demurrer to
Date: August 09, 2016Stipulation & Order
Date: August 08, 2016Stipulation & Order
Date: August 05, 2016Hearing on Joinder
Date: August 05, 2016Hearing on Joinder
Date: August 05, 2016Motion to Stay
Date: August 05, 2016Stipulation & Order
Date: August 04, 2016Reply
Date: August 01, 2016Stipulation & Order
Date: July 28, 2016Order
Date: July 28, 2016Ex Parte
Date: July 28, 2016Joinder
Date: July 11, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing Order Approving Allocation of Attorney's Fees Between Co-Lead Counsel Affidavit of Mailing Order Approving Allocation of Attorney's Fees Between Co-Lead Counsel |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing Order Approving Allocation of Attorney's Fees Between Co-Lead Counsel Order After Hearing Order Approving Allocation of Attorney's Fees Between Co-Lead Counsel |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Approval 11/02/2018 Motion for Approval Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event | See minutes entered on concurrent hearing on the same date | |
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Attorney Fees 11/02/2018 Motion for Attorney Fees Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support COTCHETT, PITRE & MCCARTHY, LLP'S REPLY MEMORANDUM O Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support COTCHETT, PITRE & MCCARTHY, LLP'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPROVE ATTORNEY FEE ALLOCATION AND OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM TO CROSS MOTION |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Approval 10/24/2018 Motion for Approval Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing Granting Unopposed Motion For Approval of Service Awards to Each Class Represent Order After Hearing Granting Unopposed Motion For Approval of Service Awards to Each Class Representative |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Opposition OF WILLIAM C FREDERICKS TO COTCHETT, PITRE AND MCCARTHY'S MOTION TO APPROV Declaration in Opposition OF WILLIAM C FREDERICKS TO COTCHETT, PITRE AND MCCARTHY'S MOTION TO APPROVE ATTORNEY FEE ALLOCATION, AND IN SUPPORT OF SCOTT + SCOTT'S CROSS MOTION TO APPROVE PREVIOUSLY AGREED FEE ALLOCATION |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition (A) TO COTCHETT, PITRE AND MCCARTHY'S MOTION TO A Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition (A) TO COTCHETT, PITRE AND MCCARTHY'S MOTION TO APPROVE ATTORNEY FEE ALLOCATION AND (b) IN SUPPORT OF SCOTT AND SCOTT'S CROSS MOTION TO APPROVE PREVIOUSLY AGREED FEE ALLOCATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.