Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Parsons Transportation Group, Inc., Terralink Communications, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hajimirzaee, Marjan, Radoslovich, Frank M, against Colonial American Casualty Andsurety Comp, Federal Insurance Comapny, Fidelity Anddeposit Company Ofmaryland, Parsons Transportation Group, Inc., Peninsula Corridorjointpowersboard, (total of 7) See All represented by Matson, Candace L, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Donald J. Ayoob presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management116 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial462 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions23 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time23 days |
Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: March 18, 2016Complaint
Date: December 29, 2014Document
Date: December 15, 2015Document
Date: December 15, 2015Document
Date: December 29, 2014Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 18, 2015Amended
Date: April 22, 2015Conversion Action
Date: January 21, 2015Document
Date: March 23, 2015Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 17, 2015Answer (Unlimited)
Date: February 25, 2015Conversion Action
Date: January 21, 2015Order
Date: December 29, 2014Conversion Action
Date: February 25, 2015Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: March 14, 2016Notice of Conditional Statement
Date: February 17, 2016Conversion Action
Date: December 15, 2015Conversion Action
Date: December 15, 2015Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: September 10, 2015Answer (Unlimited)
Date: August 27, 2015Document
Date: August 21, 2015Answer (Unlimited)
Date: July 24, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: July 16, 2015Conversion Action
Date: June 19, 2015Answer (Unlimited)
Date: June 19, 2015Conversion Action
Date: June 04, 2015Document
Date: June 01, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: May 27, 2015Answer (Unlimited)
Date: May 18, 2015Conversion Action
Date: May 18, 2015Notice
Date: April 28, 2015Conversion Action
Date: April 13, 2015Order
Date: April 17, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: April 09, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT |
|
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Dept: 21 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT |
|
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute NOH: NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 10. DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 10. DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Dept: 21 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PARSONS TRANSPORTATION GROUP, INC. WITH PREJUDICE IN IT Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDC1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PARSONS TRANSPORTATION GROUP, INC. WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED. |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute CODWP: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PARSONS TRANSPORTATION GROUP, INC. AND ALL PARTIES DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute CDIS: CASE DISMISSED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.