Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Acosta, Jose, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hale, Michael E, against Pellarin Construction Group Inc, Pellarin, John Rudolf, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Steven L. Dylina presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2014 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time302 days |
Case Management Statement
Date: April 02, 2015Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: October 14, 2015Complaint
Date: December 16, 2014Case Management Statement
Date: June 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Dept: 21 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute HC: HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/15/16 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT 21. |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute NAP: NO APPEARANCE IS MADE BY ANY PARTIES HEREIN OR THEIR COUNSEL OF RECORD. |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute FFT: IF THIS MATTER DOES NOT SETTLE, THE DEFENDANTS ARE TO BE SERVED PRIOR TO THE NEXT CMC. |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute MICMS: ENTERED BY C LYSSAND ON 10/15/15. |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute PDUCMS: PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT SHALL SUBMIT AN UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judge: Dylina, Steven L. |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute JCR1: HONORABLE STEVEN L. DYLINA, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: CHERYL LYSSAND. COURT REPORTER: NONE. Judge: Dylina, Steven L. |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COM1: - 11 - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.