Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Schmitz, Ruth M, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Powell, Nancy V., against Dwyer, Helen Rita, represented by Siegal, Leonard J., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2014 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time100 days |
Document
Date: July 15, 2015Conversion Action
Date: July 15, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: April 02, 2015Document
Date: February 17, 2015Conversion Action
Date: March 26, 2015Answer (Unlimited)
Date: February 09, 2015Complaint
Date: December 16, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment issued AI: (S) ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 150807-0439-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR AMENDMENT OF JUDGMENT, FILED. Document FILED: STIPULATION FOR AMENDMENT OF JUDGMENT, FILED. |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
AMENDED JUDGMENT FILED Conversion Action AJU: AMENDED JUDGMENT FILED |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
First Paper Fee Paid FFP4: MOTION FEE PAID BY RUTH M SCHMITZ. |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 150713-0442-CK 037/ 20.00 PAYMT |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action COMM: STIP RE AMENDMENT OF JUDGMENT RCV'D AND LOCATED TO DEPT 7 FOR SIGNATURE. |
|
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Conversion Hearing |
|
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Dept: 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HELEN RITA DWYER. Case Management Statement CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HELEN RITA DWYER. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.