Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lathrop, Mary Louise, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mcgee, William R, against Ford Motor Company, represented by Kelley, Sheila D., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Steven L. Dylina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven L. Dylina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2014 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial341 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time295 days |
This complaint is filed by Mary Louise Lathrop against Ford Motor Company and Does 1 through 10. Mary Louise Lathrop alleges that Ford Motor Company, a corporation registered in California, sold her a 2033 Ford Fiesta vehicle with repeated transmissi...
Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: May 08, 2015Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: October 01, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: March 11, 2015Complaint
Date: December 10, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 8 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 8 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Dept: 21 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action ADRMEO: MEDIATION WITH MIKE RANDNAN. |
|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action *620*: HMSC CALENDARED ON 11/06/15 IN DEPT. 7. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 11/06/15 IN DEPT. 21. |
|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 05/07/15 Stipulation and Order to ADR SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 05/07/15 |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action COMM: STIP & ORDER TO ADR RECEIVED AND SENT TO DEPT. 7. |
|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute CACC: COUNSEL WILLIAM R. MCGEE FOR PLAINTIFF APPEARED BY COURT CALL. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.