Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Woodfin, Donald Ray, Woodfin, Georgia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cattermole, Gregory C, against Cruz, Ramiro C, Does 1 To 25, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Steven L. Dylina presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management122 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2014 |
Category(46) Unlimited Uninsured Motorist |
|
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time304 days |
Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: October 08, 2015Amendment filed. Naming Doe/Roe
Date: June 15, 2015Complaint
Date: December 08, 2014Case Management Statement
Date: April 07, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute MICMS: ENTERED BY C LYSSAND ON 10/08/15. |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute JCR1: HONORABLE STEVEN L. DYLINA, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: CHERYL LYSSAND. COURT REPORTER: NONE. Judge: Dylina, Steven L. |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute FFT: FILED. THE COURT REMOVES THIS MATTER FROM THE CMC CALENDAR. |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COM1: - 15 - |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Dept: 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judge: Dylina, Steven L. |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute FFT: THE COURT IS INFORMED THIS MATTER HAS BEEN ARBITRATED AND A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WILL BE |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute AT: ATTORNEY(S): GREGORY C. CATTERMOLE APPEARED ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFFS. |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judge: Dylina, Steven L. |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action *620*: HCMC1I CALENDARED ON 10/08/15 IN DEPT. 21. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 10/08/15 IN DEPT. 7. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.