Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gonzalez, Jennel M, Miller, James A, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Llewellyn, Paul T, against County Of San Mateo, County Of San Mateo Corner Robert Foucrault, County Of San Mateo Coroner'S Office, represented by John C. Beiers, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Robert D. Foiles presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Time To Trial465 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions75 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time182 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by plaintiffs Jennel M. Gonzalez and James A. Miller against defendants County of San Mateo Coroner's Office, County of San Mateo, County of San Mateo Coroner Robert Foucrault, and Does 1 to 25. The plaintiffs...
Document
Date: September 22, 2015Notice
Date: December 23, 2015Request
Date: November 13, 2015Declaration
Date: November 13, 2015Conversion Action
Date: November 13, 2015Declaration
Date: January 15, 2016Order
Date: March 07, 2016Declaration
Date: November 13, 2015Document
Date: April 27, 2016Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: April 13, 2016Notice of Conditional Statement
Date: March 08, 2016Document
Date: January 22, 2016Document
Date: January 22, 2016Document
Date: January 15, 2016Response
Date: January 15, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 15, 2016Notice
Date: November 20, 2015Order
Date: November 20, 2015Notice
Date: June 09, 2015Conversion Action
Date: June 05, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: June 03, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: June 01, 2015Notice
Date: May 18, 2015Order
Date: May 15, 2015Answer (Unlimited)
Date: May 13, 2015Document
Date: April 28, 2015Opposition
Date: April 22, 2015Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 02, 2015Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 02, 2015Conversion Action
Date: April 02, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: March 24, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: March 20, 2015Conversion Action
Date: March 17, 2015Notice
Date: March 02, 2015Order
Date: March 02, 2015Document
Date: February 09, 2015Opposition
Date: February 03, 2015Document
Date: January 16, 2015Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 16, 2015Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 16, 2015Complaint
Date: December 05, 2014Conversion Action
Date: January 16, 2015Document
Date: November 13, 2015Document
Date: November 13, 2015Declaration
Date: November 13, 2015Declaration
Date: November 13, 2015Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 13, 2015Document
Date: October 01, 2015Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: July 31, 2015Document
Date: July 24, 2015Document
Date: July 16, 2015Document
Date: July 14, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute NOH: NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Dept: 21 OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION |
|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
REMITTITUR FILED ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FILED APPEAL IS DISMISSED. Document IMGDOC: REMITTITUR FILED ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FILED APPEAL IS DISMISSED. |
|
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION ON 05/03/16 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 21. Document IMGDOC: CLERK'S NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION ON 05/03/16 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 21. |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY JENNEL M GONZALEZ Notice of Conditional Statement NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY JENNEL M GONZALEZ |
|
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC., SIGNED BY JUDG Order O2: ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC., SIGNED BY JUDGE AYOOB ON 03/04/16 FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.