Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Churillo, Gail, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ginsburg, William S, against Barrientos, Evaristo Rodriguez, Corona, Ema, Penapadilla, Griselda Isavel, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Robert D. Foiles presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time686 days |
Case Management Statement
Date: October 20, 2016Request For Dismissal
Date: November 14, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: March 16, 2016Ex Parte Application
Date: March 23, 2015Complaint
Date: December 05, 2014Case Management Statement
Date: March 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Dept: 21 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Request For Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 12/6/16 Notice of Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 12/6/16 |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address of Attorney | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute HC: HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/17/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT 21. |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute PGN: PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE. |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Dept: 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judge: Dylina, Steven L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.