Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Benson, Brandon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Seabaugh, Scott, against Luxor Cabs, Inc., Regalado, Daniel, Sajid, Wadiwala, represented by Morozumi, Damien, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Robert D. Foiles presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial416 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time466 days |
This complaint is a wrongful death case. The plaintiff, Brandon Benson, is suing Luxor Cabs, Inc, Daniel Regalado, and Wadiwala Sajid, individually and doing business as Luxor Cab Co, along with Does 1 to 30. The complaint alleges negligence and seek...
Case Management Statement
Date: March 20, 2015Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: May 13, 2015Notice of Conditional Statement
Date: January 12, 2016Answer (Unlimited)
Date: February 24, 2015Complaint
Date: December 05, 2014Case Management Statement
Date: March 27, 2015Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: March 15, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute NOH: NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Dept: 21 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
CIV 531603 - NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL HEARING 4/12/16. Document IMGDOC: CIV 531603 - NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL HEARING 4/12/16. |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute JCR1: HONORABLE ROBERT D. FOILES, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: ALEXANDRINA ORTEGA. COURT REPORTER: NONE. Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute MICMS: ENTERED BY A ORTEGA ON 01/11/16. |
|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Dept: 21 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.