Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Chan, Peter, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Aquino, Aaron A, against Morgan, Mie Kimura, represented by Keddy, Michael F., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Susan I. Etezadi presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial521 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time468 days |
This complaint is a personal injury case filed by Peter Chan against Mie Kimura Morgan. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendant, resulting in injuries and damages to the plaintiff. The incident occurred on December 5, 2012, at t...
Opposition
Date: September 22, 2015Declaration
Date: September 22, 2015Answer (Unlimited)
Date: January 06, 2015Conversion Action
Date: September 23, 2015Declaration
Date: September 23, 2015Declaration
Date: August 14, 2015Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: November 13, 2015Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: March 17, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 14, 2015Motion
Date: August 14, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: August 07, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: July 23, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: March 27, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: March 24, 2015Complaint
Date: December 05, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Dept: 21 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PETER CHAN. Conversion Action NEDPS: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PETER CHAN. |
|
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing COURT`S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADR DUE ON 09/11/15 |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Hearing Dept: 21 COURT`S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADR DUE ON 09/11/15 |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute HV: HEARING VACATED. REASON: ADR STIPULATION RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO CLERK FOR PROCESSING |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY ROBERT D. FOILES ON 11/12/15 Stipulation and Order to ADR SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY ROBERT D. FOILES ON 11/12/15 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.