Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Caballero, Ilda, Marriott Claims Services, Newell, Brian, Ritz Carlton Hotel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Abel, Robert B, Jr, Howell, Alison E, Scotto, Vincent J., against Jolley, Joey Oscar, represented by Atterbury, Jeff B., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Donald J. Ayoob presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management113 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial452 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time460 days |
This complaint is filed by Ilda Caballero against Joey Oscar Jolley and Does 1-50 for negligence. The complaint states that the defendants, who are agents, servants, partners, employees, joint venturers, lessees, and franchisees of each other, owned ...
Motion
Date: January 13, 2016Notice of Conditional Statement
Date: February 09, 2016Conversion Action
Date: February 02, 2016Declaration
Date: January 22, 2016Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: February 23, 2016Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: March 08, 2016Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 22, 2016Order
Date: January 13, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: May 08, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: May 07, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: May 05, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: March 17, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: March 17, 2015Answer (Unlimited)
Date: February 03, 2015Complaint
Date: December 04, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Dept: 21 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute NOH: NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute HV: HEARING VACATED. REASON: CASE DISMISSED ON 03/11/16 |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute MICMS: ENTERED BY A ORTEGA ON 03/17/16. |
|
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute CDWP: 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARRIOTT CLAIMS SERVICES DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO JOEY OSCAR JOLLEY. |
|
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARRIOTT CLAIMS SERVICES WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS EN Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDC1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARRIOTT CLAIMS SERVICES WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED. |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDC1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT OF CABALLERO WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED. |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT OF CABALLERO WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED. Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDC1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT OF CABALLERO WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED. |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute CDWP: COMPLAINT OF CABALLERO DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO JOEY OSCAR JOLLEY. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.