Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Aguayo, Ambar, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Himmelheber, Dan M., against Cherolis, Carolynn Hart, represented by Yoshimura, Frances H, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Steven L. Dylina presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management113 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial452 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time404 days |
This complaint is a personal injury case involving a motor vehicle accident. The plaintiff, Ambar Aguayo, is alleging negligence on the part of the defendant, Carolynn Hart Cherolis, and other unknown defendants. The accident occurred on August 13, 2...
Conversion Action
Date: December 07, 2015Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: January 12, 2016Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: August 20, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: June 11, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: June 09, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: March 16, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: March 09, 2015Answer (Unlimited)
Date: January 20, 2015Complaint
Date: December 04, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 7. DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 7. DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Dept: 21 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Dept: 21 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute NOH: NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CAROLYNN HART CHEROLIS. Conversion Action NEDPS: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CAROLYNN HART CHEROLIS. |
|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
CIV 531574 - NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL HEARING 1/26/16. Document IMGDOC: CIV 531574 - NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL HEARING 1/26/16. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.