Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Braccini, Sabrina, Lopez, Roberto, Stanislawski, Raymond, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Zuchowski, Bruce E., against Braccini, Sabrina, Lopez, Roberto, represented by Hartnett, Eric T., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Steven L. Dylina presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management133 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2014 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial382 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time251 days |
This complaint is filed by Raymond Stanislawski, doing business as Semper Fi Renovations, against Sabrina Braccini and Roberto Lopez. The complaint alleges breach of contract and seeks damages and foreclosure of a mechanic's lien. Raymond Stanislawsk...
Case Management Statement
Date: January 23, 2015Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: March 12, 2015Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: June 04, 2015Complaint
Date: September 26, 2014Document
Date: January 23, 2015Answer (Unlimited)
Date: December 22, 2014Conversion Action
Date: December 02, 2014General Denial filed
Date: December 02, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Dept: 7 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action ADRMEO: MEDIATION WITH BRAD BENING. |
|
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY SD ON 03/11/15 Stipulation and Order to ADR SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY SD ON 03/11/15 |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action COMM: STIP & ORDER TO ADR RECEIVED AND SENT TO DEPT. 7. |
|
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR ADRSTP: PRINT ADR STIPULATION DUE NOTICE. |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE Conversion Action PNTWO: PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.