Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
The Best Service Company Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stapleton, Christopher, against Meneses, Guillermo, Meneses, Maria I, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Robert D. Foiles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert D. Foiles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 04, 2011 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal case filed by THE BEST SERVICE CO. INC. against GUILLERMO MENESES AKA GUILLERMO A MENESES, individually and doing business as MENESES CONSTRUCTION, and MARIA I MENESES, individually and doing business as MENESES CONSTRUCTION...
91210Memor00c72e
Date: February 01, 2024Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: February 01, 2021Complaint
Date: November 04, 2011Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: November 09, 2012Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: August 28, 2017APP - MENESES
Date: March 09, 2022MEMO - MENESES
Date: March 09, 2022NOTICE - MENESES
Date: March 09, 2022POSM MENESES_20220331115103
Date: April 04, 202258770Memor00d35c
Date: June 08, 2022Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: August 28, 2017Summons Issued / Filed
Date: November 04, 2011Answer (Unlimited)
Date: December 19, 2011Declaration
Date: February 01, 2021Writ of Execution Return
Date: September 02, 2021Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: December 03, 2021Writ of Execution Return
Date: February 23, 2022Notice of Renewal of Judgment
Date: March 09, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: April 04, 2022Application for & Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190)
Date: March 09, 2022Conversion Hearing
Date: March 14, 2012Writ of Execution Return
Date: February 15, 2019Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: February 01, 2021Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: June 08, 2022Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: March 09, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 04, 2011Conversion Action
Date: August 12, 2013NOTICE - MENESES
Date: July 21, 2022DECLARATION RE CLERICAL ERROR ON APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL
Date: July 21, 2022AMENDED APPLICATOIN FOR AN DRENEWAL OF JUDGMNET
Date: July 21, 202261405Proof006ea3
Date: August 04, 2022Notice of Renewal of Judgment
Date: July 21, 2022Declaration
Date: July 21, 2022Application for & Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190)
Date: July 21, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: August 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | 91210Memor00c72e | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | 61405Proof006ea3 | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT Proof of Service by MAIL of APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE - MENESES | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE CLERICAL ERROR ON APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED APPLICATOIN FOR AN DRENEWAL OF JUDGMNET | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Renewal of Judgment | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF CHRISTOPHER STAPLETON TO AMEND CLERICAL ERROR ON APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL AND ORDER Declaration OF CHRISTOPHER STAPLETON TO AMEND CLERICAL ERROR ON APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL AND ORDER |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application for & Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190) AMENDEDAgainst: GUILLERMO MENESES AKA GUILLERMO A ME Application for & Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190) AMENDED Against: GUILLERMO MENESES AKA GUILLERMO A MENESES INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA MENESES CONSTRUCTION; MARIA I MENESES INDIV. AND DBA MENESES CONSTRUCTION |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of SAN FRANCISCO Issued On: 6/14/2022 Amount: $109,819.38 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.