Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hernandez, Eduardo A, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Galletta, Jessica R., against American Mortgage Express Corporation, Bac Home Loans Servicing, Lp, Bank Of America, National Association, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, Lp, (total of 12) See All represented by Deangelis, Paul P., Kim, Rosalie Euna, Pham, Yvonne, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Grandsaert, John L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 29, 2011 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint alleges multiple claims against various defendants, including breach of contract, negligence, fraud, violation of civil codes, wrongful foreclosure, and more. The plaintiff, Eduardo A. Hernandez, disputes the title and ownership of the...
Notice
Date: March 10, 2014Declaration
Date: January 16, 2014Notice
Date: February 06, 2014Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: July 30, 2013Declaration
Date: July 03, 2013Motion
Date: July 03, 2013Notice
Date: June 10, 2013Case Management Statement
Date: May 20, 2013Case Management Statement
Date: June 04, 2013Answer (Unlimited)
Date: May 03, 2013Conversion Action
Date: April 26, 2013Document
Date: April 23, 2013Order
Date: April 17, 2013Document
Date: April 23, 2013Case Management Statement
Date: April 23, 2013Order
Date: April 17, 2013Declaration
Date: April 02, 2013Motion
Date: April 02, 2013Declaration
Date: March 19, 2013Order
Date: March 13, 2013Opposition
Date: March 13, 2013Document
Date: March 18, 2013Notice
Date: March 18, 2013Notice
Date: March 13, 2013Declaration
Date: February 15, 2013Case Management Statement
Date: August 15, 2012Case Management Statement
Date: August 17, 2012Case Management Statement
Date: August 10, 2012Opposition
Date: June 11, 2012Document
Date: July 05, 2012Opposition
Date: June 11, 2012Declaration
Date: February 18, 2014Opposition
Date: February 18, 2014Motion
Date: January 16, 2014Order
Date: January 31, 2014Declaration
Date: January 16, 2014Document
Date: January 16, 2014Conversion Action
Date: February 10, 2012Complaint
Date: August 29, 2011Case Management Statement
Date: January 30, 2013Document
Date: February 13, 2013Declaration
Date: January 16, 2013Case Management Statement
Date: January 28, 2013Conversion Action
Date: January 24, 2013Notice
Date: January 04, 2013Order
Date: December 11, 2012Answer (Unlimited)
Date: November 13, 2012Conversion Action
Date: November 09, 2012Conversion Action
Date: October 11, 2012Case Management Statement
Date: September 14, 2012Case Management Statement
Date: September 18, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Notice N: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. |
|
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COM1: - 9 - |
|
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute LINE: ===================================== |
|
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute MICMS: ENTERED BY PDEANG ON 03/04/14. |
|
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute FFT: WARRANTING THE RECONSIDERATION. |
|
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute FFT: COURT RECONSIDER THE ORDER THAT WAS MADE; THERE IS NO SHOWING THAT THERE WERE NEW FACTS OF LAW |
|
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute FFT: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. THE COURT ORDERS THE PLAINTIFF IS NOT ENTITLED TO HAVE THE |
|
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute HCSM: HAVING CONSIDERED THE SUBMITTED MATTER, THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: |
|
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute MAS: MATTER ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED TO THE COURT. |
|
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COM: ABOVE-NOTED COUNSEL PRESENT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.