Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mcdonough, Alan, Mcdonough, Patrice, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Liuzzi, Frank C., against Scatena, Casey, Scatena, Tiffany, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2011 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a personal injury case involving property damage and wrongful death. The plaintiffs, Alan McDonough and Patrice McDonough, are alleging causes of action against the defendants, Casey Scatena and Tiffany Scatena. The complaint states...
Complaint
Date: August 26, 2011Summons Issued / Filed
Date: August 26, 2011Conversion Hearing
Date: December 16, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Dept: 7 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Conversion Hearing |
|
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Dept: 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
December 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action CDCS: CASE DISPO`D - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED |
|
November 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action NS2: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ALAN MCDONOUGH, PATRICE MCDONOUGH. |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document FILED: ERRATA COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFF, FILED. |
|
August 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
(S) COMPLAINT FILED Complaint COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED |
|
August 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED. Summons Issued / Filed S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.