Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
C, E, Cruz, Timoteo, Martinez, Estela Antonio, Rosas, Micaela, Vasquez, Florencia, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Holdenried, Lisel, against Marchi Central Farms, Marchi, Gerald, Marchi, Natalino, Marchi, Peter, represented by Pierce, Jacqueline M., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Grandsaert, John L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2011 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 31, 2012Conversion Action
Date: February 27, 2013Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: February 13, 2013Answer (Unlimited)
Date: November 07, 2011Complaint
Date: August 25, 2011Conversion Action
Date: December 15, 2011Document
Date: June 27, 2012Notice of Conditional Statement
Date: July 10, 2012Notice
Date: November 19, 2012Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 07, 2013Order
Date: July 12, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Dept: 7 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT |
|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT |
|
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED. REASON: ENTIRE CASE WAS DISMISSED ON 02/13/13. Conversion Action DNE: DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED. REASON: ENTIRE CASE WAS DISMISSED ON 02/13/13. |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS, SIGNED BY JUDGE SWOPE ON 02/1 Order O2: ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS, SIGNED BY JUDGE SWOPE ON 02/14/13 FILED. |
|
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NATALINO MARCHI, PETER MARCHI, GERALD MA Notice N2: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NATALINO MARCHI, PETER MARCHI, GERALD MARCHI, MARCHI CENTRAL FARMS. |
|
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order after Hearing Received and Forwarded to Department OAHRF: ORDER AFTER HEARING FOR 01/25/13 RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. 23. |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF SEE LIST SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 01/18/13 F Proof of Service by MAIL of PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF SEE LIST SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 01/18/13 FILED. |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute MICMS: ENTERED BY S.HARRIS ON 01/25/13. |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute FFT: COURT. THE ORDER IS TO BE SUBMITTED DIRECTLY TO JUDGE V. RAYMOND SWOPE, DEPARTMENT 23. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.