Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gryphon Solutions,Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Willens, Ian, against Blackford, Brian D, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2011 |
Category(09) Unlimited Other Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a verified complaint for judicial foreclosure of a lien and declaratory relief. The plaintiff, Gryphon Solutions, LLC, is a limited liability company engaged in debt collection. The defendants named in the complaint are Brian D Blac...
Complaint
Date: August 25, 2011Summons Issued / Filed
Date: August 25, 2011Conversion Hearing
Date: December 16, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document FILED: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY IAN WILLENS FOR PLAINTIFF GRYPHON SOLUTIONS, LLC, FILED. |
|
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Conversion Hearing |
|
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Dept: 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF GRYPHON SOLUTIONS, LLC SERVED ON BRIAN D BLACKFORD WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/30/11. |
|
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
(S) COMPLAINT FILED Complaint COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED |
|
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED. Summons Issued / Filed S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED. |
|
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Civil Case Cover Sheet CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.