Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Provident Funding Associates, L.P., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by O'Hanlon, Neil R., against Western National Bank, represented by Buckley, Mike C, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Grandsaert, John L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2011 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Complaint
Date: April 28, 2011Answer (Unlimited)
Date: July 12, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing COURT TRIAL (LONG CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE: 3 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Dept: PJ COURT TRIAL (LONG CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE: 3 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Dept: 7 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
October 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
September 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to ADR SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY STEVEN L. DYLINA ON 09/14/11 |
|
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action COMM: STIPULATION TO ADR DUE. |
|
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action COMM: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR FORWARDED TO DEPT. #7. |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action PNTWO: PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COM1: - 7 - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.