Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Davis, Joan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Joesten, Nan E, against Venners, Theodore, represented by Townsend, Kasey Covert, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Grandsaert, John L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2011 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Conversion Action
Date: June 04, 2012Answer (Unlimited)
Date: June 12, 2012Answer (Unlimited)
Date: September 30, 2011Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: April 24, 2013Conversion Action
Date: December 26, 2012Complaint
Date: April 26, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
May 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Dept: 7 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JOAN DAVIS. Conversion Action NEDPS: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JOAN DAVIS. |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute HCONT: HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/28/13 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT PJ. |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute HCONT: HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/10/13 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT 7. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.