Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cell-Crete Corp, Shank Balfour Beatty, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Graham, Christian, against Old Republic Surety Company, Shank Balfour Beatty, Vigilant Insurancecompay, represented by Baker, Michael J, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Grandsaert, John L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2011 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Answer (Unlimited)
Date: August 17, 2011Conversion Action
Date: July 29, 2011Answer (Unlimited)
Date: August 19, 2011Conversion Action
Date: July 29, 2011Answer (Unlimited)
Date: July 29, 2011Complaint
Date: April 20, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 4 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 4 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Dept: 7 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDC1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT OF CELL-CRETE CORP WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED. |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute CODWP: COMPLAINT OF CELL-CRETE CORP AND ALL PARTIES DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
(S) ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SHANK/BALFOUR BEATTY FILED BY CELL-CRETE CORP, REPRESENTED BY CHRI Answer (Unlimited) ANS: (S) ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SHANK/BALFOUR BEATTY FILED BY CELL-CRETE CORP, REPRESENTED BY CHRISTIAN GRAHAM |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
(S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF CELL-CRETE CORP FILED BY VIGILANT INSURANCE COMPAY, REPRESENTED BY MICHA Answer (Unlimited) ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF CELL-CRETE CORP FILED BY VIGILANT INSURANCE COMPAY, REPRESENTED BY MICHAEL J BAKER |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 110817-0512-CK 167/ 395.00 PAYMT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.