Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hernandez, Antonio H., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Margulies, Harold P., against Hernandez, Celia L., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey G. Bennett Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryOther Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions161 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time4959 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
July 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ issued. | |
July 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Abstract issued. | |
June 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court. | |
June 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Judgment for HERNANDEZ, ANTONIO H. against HERNANDEZ, CELIA L. in the amount of: 7563.68 principal, 328.85 costs, 1176.55 pre-judgment interest, and attorney fees entered on 06/29/2007. | |
June 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Court's OSC - Failure to File Judgment - scheduled for 06/29/2007 at 08:10:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
June 29, 2007 | |||
June 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Order - Other (granting use of copies) filed by HERNANDEZ, ANTONIO H. on 06/29/2007. | |
June 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by HERNANDEZ, ANTONIO H. on 06/29/2007. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.