Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Arrow Financial Services, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Loeb, Steven S, against Pardines, Jeanette, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kent M. Kellegrew presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKent M. Kellegrew Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time3122 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event | 03/28/2007: COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON COMPLAINT of ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC AS TO ALL UNSERVED NAMED DEFENDANTS Hearing: OFF-CALENDAR | |
March 14, 2007 | Docket Event | 03/14/2007: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action WITHOUT Prejudice filed | |
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event | 03/09/2007: Proof of Service (Sub-Service) of Summons and COMPLAINT of ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC as to JEANETTE PARDINES, by sub-serving CINDY FARNER. Mailing date of 02/06/07. | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | 12/29/2006: Track assignment: Economic | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | 12/29/2006: Case Information Sheet filed. Type of trial requested: COURT. Estimated time: 30 MINS. Mediation eligible NO | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | 12/29/2006: Summons Issued; 30 day - Original retained in Court file | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | 12/29/2006: Complaint (Limited - prayer amount $10,000.00 or less) filed Filed By: ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: PARDINES, JEANETTE(Defendant) | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | 12/29/2006: Amount prayed: $2906.26 PLUS INTEREST; ATTORNEYS FEES; AND COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.