Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Davis, Fred, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Rosenberg, John P., against Doe 1 Employee, Albertson'S Inc, represented by Stone, Gregory E Esq, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2005 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time2778 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed pursuant to GC 68152(d) 1 or 2 | |
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event | 04/20/2007: Superior Jury Trust Void Receipt Number: 704200130 for $150.0 | |
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event | 04/20/2007: Jury fees TRANSMITTED to the Trial Court Trust Fund Pursuant to CCP 631.3 - Jury fees deposited previously on behalf of FRED DAVIS in the amount of $150.00 by JOHN P ROSENBERG Receipt Number: 704200131 for $150.0 | |
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event | 04/20/2007: %%X%% 070420-0130 VOIDED 061107-0128 ( 150.00) | |
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event | 01/05/2007: COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 225 Hearing: VACATED | |
December 14, 2006 | Docket Event | 12/14/2006: Request for Dismissal WITH prejudice filed by FRED DAVIS after previous order of dismissal without prejudice by the court. | |
December 04, 2006 | Docket Event | 12/04/2006: JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 7 days 0:00 hours Hearing: DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
November 20, 2006 | Docket Event | 11/20/2006: Notice of Settlement filed by FRED DAVIS | |
November 15, 2006 | Docket Event | 11/15/2006: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Hearing: SETTLED | |
November 08, 2006 | Docket Event | 11/08/2006: Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received from FRED DAVIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.