Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gomez, Lisa, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2005 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time3328 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 21, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/21/2006: Decree Changing Name filed | |
February 21, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/21/2006: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME Hearing: GRANTED | |
February 02, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/02/2006: Certificate of Publication re: Name Change filed | |
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/03/2006: Order to Show Cause re: Change of Name filed | |
December 27, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/27/2005: Vertical Case Assignment 43 - Ventura | |
December 27, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/27/2005: Petition for Change of Name filed Receipt Number: 512270161 for $235.0 Filed By: GOMEZ, LISA(Petitioner) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.