Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wescom Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn, Brian N., against Flores, Rosendo Marquez, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 23, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions83 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time4433 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event | 01/02/2007: Writ of EXECUTION (EXPIRED) from Ventura County returned NOT satisfied | |
May 11, 2006 | Docket Event | 05/11/2006: --- Credits in the amount of $0.00. | |
May 11, 2006 | Docket Event | 05/11/2006: Writ of Execution for Money (Limited) Issued for Ventura County in the amount of $14273.71 | |
May 11, 2006 | Docket Event | 05/11/2006: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment (total of all postjudgment costs $0.00), Acknowledgment of Credit (total credit to date $0.00) and Declaration of Accrued Interest (amount of $204.08) filed by WESCOM CREDIT UNION | |
May 11, 2006 | Docket Event | 05/11/2006: Uniform Civil Filing Fee Paid by WESCOM CREDIT UNION (Issuing writ of attachment, writ of mandate, writ of execution, writ of sale, writ of possession, writ of prohibition, writ of restitution or other enforcement) Receipt Number: 605110190 for $15.0 | |
May 04, 2006 | Docket Event | 05/04/2006: Abstract of Judgment (Limited) issued and copy filed | |
May 04, 2006 | Docket Event | 05/04/2006: Uniform Civil Filing Fee Paid by WESCOM CREDIT UNION (Issuing abstract of judgment) Receipt Number: 605040055 for $15.0 | |
March 16, 2006 | Docket Event | 03/16/2006: Attorney fees are $1932.49 | |
March 16, 2006 | Docket Event | 03/16/2006: Judgment entered on COMPLAINT of WESCOM CREDIT UNION for WESCOM CREDIT UNION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.