Case Last Refreshed: 8 hours ago
filed a(n) Civil Limited (Legacy) case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2005 |
CategoryCivil Limited (Legacy) |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
August 08, 2006 | Docket Event | Original Summons returned as to COMPLAINT of PALISADES COLLECTION LLC | |
August 08, 2006 | Docket Event | 08/08/2006: Original Summons returned as to COMPLAINT of PALISADES COLLECTION LLC | |
July 25, 2006 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Entire Action WITHOUT Prejudice filed | |
July 25, 2006 | Docket Event | 07/25/2006: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action WITHOUT Prejudice filed | |
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) Hearing: VACATED | |
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event | 05/12/2006: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) Hearing: VACATED | |
April 28, 2006 | Docket Event | (S) COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT Hearing: COMPLETED | |
April 28, 2006 | Docket Event | 04/28/2006: (S) COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT Hearing: COMPLETED | |
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by PALISADES COLLECTION LLC. Status Hearing set on 05/12/06 at 8:10 in courtroom 22B is vacated |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.